Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 02:05:10 (UTC).

Rose VS Moqim

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Rose filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against Moqim. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD SEABOLT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1392

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD SEABOLT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSE, LINDA

Defendants

MOQIM, QASEMI ABDUL

MOQIM, MONESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RAVESCROFT, JACQUELINE

REILLY, DAVIS J.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/5/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/30/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/30/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/29/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 09/30/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

9/23/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 09/30/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

1/6/2021: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Case Management Statement of Linda Rose Filed

12/21/2020: Case Management Statement of Linda Rose Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

12/23/2020: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Monesa Moqim, Qasemi Abdul Moqim

9/29/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Monesa Moqim, Qasemi Abdul Moqim

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

9/29/2020: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Case Management Statement of Linda Rose Filed

9/11/2020: Case Management Statement of Linda Rose Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Monesa Moqim Filed

7/29/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Monesa Moqim Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Qasemi Abdul Moqim Filed

7/29/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Qasemi Abdul Moqim Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

7/7/2020: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Delbert C. Gee Filed for Linda Rose

5/22/2020: Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Delbert C. Gee Filed for Linda Rose

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Linda Rose

5/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Linda Rose

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/11/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 09/30/2020 03:00 PM D- 514

5/20/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 09/30/2020 03:00 PM D- 514

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Complaint - Wrongful Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/20/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 03/22/2022 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 04/15/2022 08:30 AM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Linda Rose Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Monesa Moqim Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCourt File Transfer to Hayward Hall of Justice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Delbert C. Gee Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Delbert C. Gee Filed for Linda Rose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/30/2020 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Linda Rose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REILLY, DAVIS J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAVENSCROFT, JACQUELINE