This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 08:24:47 (UTC).

Romero VS Mann

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 Romero filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against Mann. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8571

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROMERO, DENIS

Defendants

MANN, BALJIT SINGH

MERA PIND LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SALINAS, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8/12/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 12/29/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

8/12/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 12/29/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

8/10/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Denis Romero

8/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Denis Romero

Complaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed

8/10/2021: Complaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Baljit Singh Mann Filed

9/21/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Baljit Singh Mann Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mera Pind LLC Filed

9/10/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mera Pind LLC Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Baljit Singh Mann Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Mera Pind LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/29/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Denis Romero

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALINAS, ROBERT