This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/14/2022 at 16:47:00 (UTC).

Rojas VS A F F Trans, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 Rojas filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against A F F Trans, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Tara Desautels. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2542

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Tara Desautels

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ekta Rani

Emelina Ericksen

Jesusa Rojas

Ranjit Brar

Troy Ericksen

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

A F F TRANS, LLC

J. B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC.

AFF Trans, LLC

City of Livermore

Ivenet Frederic

J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.

Union Pacific Railroad Company

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Austin Smith

Bradley D. Fell

Bradley David Fell

Jacob D. Flesher

Jason O. Runckel

Jason Schaff

Joseph Kim

Kevin Kay Cholakian

Melvin Marcia

Peter Dubrawski

Richard W. Osman

Richard William Osman

Sheila D Crawford

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 11/04/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

6/28/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 11/04/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR STAY OF ALL CIVIL PROCEEDINGS PENDING THE COMPLETION OF CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS

06/08/2022: Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR STAY OF ALL CIVIL PROCEEDINGS PENDING THE COMPLETION OF CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS

Declaration DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STAY OF CIVIL ACTIONS PENDING COMPLETION OF CRIMINAL MATTERS

06/08/2022: Declaration DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STAY OF CIVIL ACTIONS PENDING COMPLETION OF CRIMINAL MATTERS

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

06/08/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Judicial Notice

06/08/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion for Stay of Proceedings

06/08/2022: Motion for Stay of Proceedings

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

05/27/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

05/20/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Case Management Statement

05/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Order to File First Amended Complaint

05/18/2022: Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Order to File First Amended Complaint

Case Management Statement

05/16/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

05/16/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

05/16/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

05/16/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

05/16/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

05/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

05/04/2022: Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

Confirming Letter to IDC

05/04/2022: Confirming Letter to IDC

106 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings scheduled for 08/10/2022 at 02:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 16; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMessage: Declaration DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STAY OF CIVIL ACTIONS PENDING COMPLETION OF CRIMINAL MATTERS Filed by: A F F Trans, LLC (Defendant); Ivenet Frederic (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMessage: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: A F F Trans, LLC (Defendant); Ivenet Frederic (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMessage: Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: A F F Trans, LLC (Defendant); Ivenet Frederic (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMessage: Motion for Stay of Proceedings Filed by: A F F Trans, LLC (Defendant); Ivenet Frederic (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by: Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/31/2022 at 01:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/22/2022 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 16; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: A F F Trans, LLC (Defendant); Ivenet Frederic (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Order to File First Amended Complaint: Result: Denied Result Date: 05/18/2022; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: Cross-Complaint Filed for J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for Union Pacific Railroad Company; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Union Pacific Railroad Company Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Livermore Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 11/04/2021 03:00 PM D- 517; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jesusa Rojas; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less