This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/15/2021 at 05:47:20 (UTC).

Roe VS Valdez

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Roe filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against Valdez. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7536

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROE, JANE

Defendants

REAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT MASTERS, INC.

VALDEZ, SERGIO E.

QUIETT, DAWANIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SALINAS, ROBERT

CRANE, ALISON M.

STONE, COLETTE F.

ANGSTADT, TODD A.

 

Court Documents

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

10/21/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jane Roe

10/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jane Roe

Complaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed

10/21/2020: Complaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11/4/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 03/10/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

11/4/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 03/10/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sergio E. Valdez Filed

11/30/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sergio E. Valdez Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Real Property Management Masters, Inc. Filed

12/15/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Real Property Management Masters, Inc. Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

12/10/2020: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Sergio E. Valdez

12/10/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Sergio E. Valdez

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Dawania Quiett Filed

11/30/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Dawania Quiett Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Real Property Management Masters, Inc. , Dawania Quiett

12/18/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Real Property Management Masters, Inc. , Dawania Quiett

Association of Attorneys Filed

1/14/2021: Association of Attorneys Filed

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

1/28/2021: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/27/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Filed

2/8/2021: Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Filed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Complaint - Wrongful Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 302; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Disassociation of Counsel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 09/01/2022 09:00 AM D- 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/23/2022 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 09/23/2022 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorneys Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Dawania Quiett Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Sergio E. Valdez Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/10/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Jane Roe Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Jane Roe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jane Roe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE, COLETTE F.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALINAS, ROBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRANE, ALISON M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANGSTADT, TODD A.