This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 15:44:16 (UTC).

Roe VS Odiwe

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 Roe filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Odiwe. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAD SELIGMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3952

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRAD SELIGMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROE2, JOHN

ROE , JANE

ROE1, JOHN

ROE3, JOHN

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MANZANAREZ , RIGOMERO

ODIWE , ANWULIKA

PETES MOVING SERVICES, LLC

ODIWE , AFAMEFUNA

BRICHKA, PETER I.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PETES MOVING SERVICES, LLC

BRICHKA, PETER I.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SALINAS, ROBERT

GARFINKEL, GREGG S.

MALTZ, ROBERT M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

6/12/2020: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/8/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/8/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/29/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/29/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/1/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/1/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

8/27/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Statement of Afamefuna Odiwe Filed

3/29/2021: Case Management Statement of Afamefuna Odiwe Filed

Cross-Complaint Filed for Petes Moving Services, LLC , Peter I. Brichka

1/12/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for Petes Moving Services, LLC , Peter I. Brichka

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

12/1/2020: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement of Afamefuna Odiwe Filed

12/2/2020: Case Management Statement of Afamefuna Odiwe Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Rigomero Manzanarez Filed

11/16/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Rigomero Manzanarez Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Rigomero Manzanarez Filed

11/16/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Rigomero Manzanarez Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Rigomero Manzanarez Filed

11/16/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Rigomero Manzanarez Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Rigomero Manzanarez Filed

11/16/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Rigomero Manzanarez Filed

Case Management Statement of Afamefuna Odiwe Filed

11/24/2020: Case Management Statement of Afamefuna Odiwe Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Anwulika Odiwe Filed

11/25/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Anwulika Odiwe Filed

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Afamefuna Odiwe Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Petes Moving Services, LLC , Peter I. Brichka

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Anwulika Odiwe Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Anwulika Odiwe Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Anwulika Odiwe Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Anwulika Odiwe Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 04/13/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketHearing Continued to Complex Determination Hearing dept: 23 date: 07/28/2020 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property - Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 10/13/2020 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 07/21/2020 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jane Roe

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PETE'S MOVING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARFINKEL, GREGG S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALINAS, ROBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MALTZ, ROBERT MARK