Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/21/2021 at 01:50:51 (UTC).

Robeson VS Joseph C. Casella trustee of the Joseph C Casella

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Robeson filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Joseph C Casella trustee of the Joseph C Casella. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS HAYASHI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1344

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DENNIS HAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBESON, JUANITA T.

Defendants

JOSEPH C. CASELAA

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

CITY OF OAKLAND

JOSEPH C. CASELLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PETERSON, P. KURT

QUIRK, MICHAEL J.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

10/30/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Case Management Statement of Juanita T. Robeson Filed

9/23/2020: Case Management Statement of Juanita T. Robeson Filed

Notice of Settlement Filed for Juanita T. Robeson

9/3/2020: Notice of Settlement Filed for Juanita T. Robeson

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

9/15/2020: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed

9/17/2020: Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/5/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/5/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

7/20/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - re: Answer in Disclaimer by Defendant PG&E Co. w

7/16/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - re: Answer in Disclaimer by Defendant PG&E Co. w

Answer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland

6/30/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

5/11/2020: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Juanita T. Robeson

5/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Juanita T. Robeson

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/11/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 10/05/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

5/20/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 10/05/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/20/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Dennis Hayashi; Department: Dept 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 01/19/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Juanita T. Robeson Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for Juanita T. Robeson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - re: Answer in Disclaimer by Defendant PG&E Co. w

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/05/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Juanita T. Robeson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific Gas and Electric Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUIRK, MICHAEL J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETERSON, P. KURT