This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 19:49:18 (UTC).

ROBERTS VS ROBERTS

Case Summary

On 10/22/2002 ROBERTS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROBERTS. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JACOB BLEA III and CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2352

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JACOB BLEA III

CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBERTS, ALLEN W.

Respondent

ROBERTS, SALLY K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2016
  • DocketEntire case imaged so as to preserve the record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2005
  • DocketMinutes: Order to Show Cause re Modification; Judge: Jacob Blea III; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2005
  • DocketStipulation and Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2005
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • DocketHearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 04/19/2005 09:00 AM D- 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • DocketHearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 04/08/2005 09:00 AM D- 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2005
  • DocketHearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 03/18/2005 09:00 AM D- 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2005
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2004
  • DocketHearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 01/28/2005 09:00 AM D- 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2004
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Exparte Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2002
  • DocketDepartment: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2002
  • DocketOSC - Family Law 12/20/2002 09:00 AM D-707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2002
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2002
  • DocketResponse FILED - FEE PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2002
  • DocketOSC - Family Law 12/04/2002 09:00 AM D-707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2002
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause FOR CC,CV,CS,OTHER:PRE DIST OF PORTION OF COMM PROP(PTNR) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2002
  • DocketSummons Filed, Date of Service: (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2002
  • DocketDeclaration UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2002
  • DocketSummons on Petition Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2002
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed

    Read MoreRead Less