******2752
06/24/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Alameda, California
HON. Nol Wise
Marilyn Risi
HEART AND DAGGER LLC
HEART AND DAGGER SALOON
Heart and Dagger, Inc.
Brian Leroy Larsen
Brian Otis Felder
Courtney Herrity O'Brien
Kevin John Holl
Luz E. Mendoza
Michelle R. Press
6/25/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 11/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 24
04/05/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
04/04/2022: Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
04/04/2022: Request for Judicial Notice
04/04/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
03/15/2022: General Order (Case Management Order)
03/04/2022: Declaration OF VLADYSLAVA V. TURNER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HEART AND DAGGER, INC., DBA HEART AND DAGGER SALOON IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSS-COMPLAINT TO FILE DEMURRER UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDUR
03/04/2022: Case Management Statement
03/04/2022: Case Management Statement
03/02/2022: Declaration DECLARATION OF VLADYSLAVA V. TURNER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HEART AND DAGGER, INC., DBA HEART AND DAGGER SALOON IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSS-COMPLAINT TO FILE DEMURRER UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDUR
02/23/2022: Answer
02/08/2022: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
02/08/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
02/08/2022: Proof of Service - Non Service
02/02/2022: Cross-Complaint
01/26/2022: General Order (Case Management Order)
01/13/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Doe 2
01/20/2022: Case Management Statement
DocketMessage: Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24; Category: Event
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Heart and Dagger, Inc. (Defendant) As to: Marilyn Risi (Plaintiff); Category: Document
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Heart and Dagger, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by: Heart and Dagger, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 06/29/2022 09:00 AM; Category: Event
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk; Category: Document
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/29/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24; Category: Event
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Declaration OF VLADYSLAVA V. TURNER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HEART AND DAGGER, INC., DBA HEART AND DAGGER SALOON IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSS-COMPLAINT TO FILE DEMURRER UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDUR Filed by: Heart and Dagger Saloon (Defendant); Heart and Dagger, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY (Defendant); Category: Document
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: City of Oakland (Cross-Complainant); Category: Document
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/08/2021 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 10/19/2021; Category: Event
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk; Category: Document
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/31/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24; Category: Event
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland; Category: Filing
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Case Management Statement of Marilyn Risi Filed; Category: Filing
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 11/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 24; Category: ScheduleHearing
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Marilyn Risi; Category: Filing
[-] Read LessDocketMessage: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed; Category: Filing
[-] Read Less