This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 12:20:09 (UTC).

Risi VS City of Oakland

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 Risi filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Oakland. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Nol Wise. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2752

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Nol Wise

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marilyn Risi

Defendants and Cross Defendants

HEART AND DAGGER LLC

HEART AND DAGGER SALOON

Heart and Dagger, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Brian Leroy Larsen

Brian Otis Felder

Courtney Herrity O'Brien

Kevin John Holl

Luz E. Mendoza

Michelle R. Press

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 11/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

6/25/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 11/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

04/05/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

04/04/2022: Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice

04/04/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

04/04/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

General Order (Case Management Order)

03/15/2022: General Order (Case Management Order)

Declaration OF VLADYSLAVA V. TURNER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HEART AND DAGGER, INC., DBA HEART AND DAGGER SALOON IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSS-COMPLAINT TO FILE DEMURRER UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PRO

03/04/2022: Declaration OF VLADYSLAVA V. TURNER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HEART AND DAGGER, INC., DBA HEART AND DAGGER SALOON IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSS-COMPLAINT TO FILE DEMURRER UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDUR

Case Management Statement

03/04/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

03/04/2022: Case Management Statement

Declaration DECLARATION OF VLADYSLAVA V. TURNER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HEART AND DAGGER, INC., DBA HEART AND DAGGER SALOON IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSS-COMPLAINT TO FILE DEMURRER UNDER CODE

03/02/2022: Declaration DECLARATION OF VLADYSLAVA V. TURNER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HEART AND DAGGER, INC., DBA HEART AND DAGGER SALOON IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSS-COMPLAINT TO FILE DEMURRER UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDUR

Answer

02/23/2022: Answer

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

02/08/2022: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

02/08/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Service - Non Service

02/08/2022: Proof of Service - Non Service

Cross-Complaint

02/02/2022: Cross-Complaint

General Order (Case Management Order)

01/26/2022: General Order (Case Management Order)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Doe 2

01/13/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Doe 2

Case Management Statement

01/20/2022: Case Management Statement

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/05/2022

DocketMessage: Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24; Category: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022

DocketMessage: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Heart and Dagger, Inc. (Defendant) As to: Marilyn Risi (Plaintiff); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketMessage: Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Heart and Dagger, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketMessage: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by: Heart and Dagger, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2022

DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 06/29/2022 09:00 AM; Category: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2022

DocketMessage: General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2022

DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/29/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24; Category: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2022

DocketMessage: Declaration OF VLADYSLAVA V. TURNER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HEART AND DAGGER, INC., DBA HEART AND DAGGER SALOON IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSS-COMPLAINT TO FILE DEMURRER UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDUR Filed by: Heart and Dagger Saloon (Defendant); Heart and Dagger, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2022

DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY (Defendant); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2022

DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: City of Oakland (Cross-Complainant); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
10/19/2021

DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/08/2021 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 10/19/2021; Category: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

DocketMessage: General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/31/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24; Category: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2021

DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland; Category: Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021

DocketMessage: Case Management Statement of Marilyn Risi Filed; Category: Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2021

DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2021

DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 11/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 24; Category: ScheduleHearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2021

DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2021

DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Marilyn Risi; Category: Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2021

DocketMessage: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed; Category: Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less