This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 07:22:28 (UTC).

Rios VS River Bend Nursing Center

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 Rios filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against River Bend Nursing Center. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4352

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MASOE, FIFITA

MASOE, TAMAFILI

RIOS, FAA ALAFAA ALAFONO

Defendants

BOEHRER, BRYAN

KAISER PERMANENTE INSURANCE COMPANY

RIVER BEND HOLDINGS, LLC

RIVER BEND NURSING CENTER

THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KLECZEK, DAVID A

 

Court Documents

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/28/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed

9/28/2021: Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Faa Alafaa Alafono Rios

9/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Faa Alafaa Alafono Rios

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

10/1/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 06/22/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

10/1/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 06/22/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/22/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Faa Alafaa Alafono Rios

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Medical Malpractice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER PERMANENTE SOUTH BAY MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLECZEK, DAVID A