Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/17/2020 at 04:15:16 (UTC).

Riley VS Therm-X of California, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 Riley filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Therm-X of California, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAD SELIGMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8523

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRAD SELIGMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOLORZANO, MARC

RILEY, KEITH

RILEY, JUSTIN

Defendant

THERM-X OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ALWAZIAN, EDWIN

MASCHLER, BRIAN P.

FERBER, MICHELLE R.

 

Court Documents

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

3/6/2020: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Tentative Case Management Order

3/13/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/12/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Posting Jury Fee's Filed

9/25/2019: Notice of Posting Jury Fee's Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Therm-X of California, Inc.

10/3/2019: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Therm-X of California, Inc.

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/13/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/13/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

8/6/2019: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Therm-X of California, Inc. Filed

7/19/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Therm-X of California, Inc. Filed

First Amended Complaint Filed

7/15/2019: First Amended Complaint Filed

Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

7/16/2019: Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/16/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Order re Case Management Filed

7/17/2019: Order re Case Management Filed

Case Management Statement of Keith Riley, Marc Solorzano Filed

7/8/2019: Case Management Statement of Keith Riley, Marc Solorzano Filed

Proof of Service by Mail of Order - Complaint Filed

7/3/2019: Proof of Service by Mail of Order - Complaint Filed

Complaint - Other Employment - Motion Rescheduled

6/18/2019: Complaint - Other Employment - Motion Rescheduled

Complaint - Other Employment Filed

5/10/2019: Complaint - Other Employment Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Keith Riley

5/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Keith Riley

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 23; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 03/17/2020 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/12/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Therm-X of California, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint - Other Employment; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketHearing Continued to Complex Determination Hearing dept: 23 date: 07/16/2019 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment - Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 07/16/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 06/18/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Keith Riley

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASCHLER, BRIAN P.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERBER, MICHELLE R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIWAZIAN EDWIN