This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/03/2022 at 22:19:26 (UTC).

Richards VS 3M Company

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 Richards filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HARRY JACOBS, JO-LYNNE Q. LEE and MICHAEL M. MARKMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8294

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

HARRY JACOBS

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

MICHAEL M. MARKMAN

 

Party Details

Defendants

CHEVRON SHIPPING COMPANY, LLC

FERGUESON ENTERPRISES LLC

TOSHIBA INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

GASKET ENGINEERING AND MACHINE

MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY INC

WARREN PUMPS LLC

NIBCO INC

MUELLER STREAM SPECIALITY

BW/IP INC

VIKING PUMP INC

SEA-LAND SERVICES INC

THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

ALLIED HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING CO INC

WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA INC

SOCO-WEST INC

JOHN CRANE, INC

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

CRANE CO

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP

101 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FISHBACK, STEPHEN M.

SINUNU, JAMES N.

PRINDLE, KENNETH B.

OBERG, LISA L.

CORDERY, THEODORE T

KIM, JASON J.

SHARP, GARY D.

MANOLI, C.J.

GARDINER, KATHERINE P

KAPPAS, DANIEL P

WAH, DOUGLAS G.

AKOPYAN, HILDA A

WATSON, ALAN J.

AMEELE, KEITH M.

ESTRADA, MICHAEL J.

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J

WOOD, J. SCOTT

LOVE, MARK A

FLYNN, MARGARET F

POND, FRANK D.

52 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/6/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/6/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/9/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/9/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/23/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/23/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/28/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/28/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

7/29/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)

06/24/2022: Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)

Request for Dismissal

06/20/2022: Request for Dismissal

2,692 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketMessage: On the Complaint filed by Richards on 01/29/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Edward Richards and Linda Richards as to NIBCO INC; Category: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18 updated: Result Date to 06/24/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Compliance Hearing); Category: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: Edward Richards (Plaintiff); Linda Richards (Plaintiff) As to: NIBCO INC (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs scheduled for 06/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/16/2022; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketMessage: On the Complaint filed by Richards on 01/29/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Edward Richards and Linda Richards as to Mueller Stream Speciality; Category: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by: FMC Corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: On the Complaint filed by Richards on 01/29/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Edward Richards and Linda Richards as to FMC Corporation; Category: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs scheduled for 05/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 06/17/2022 10:00 AM; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
2,511 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: for Order Directing Service of Summons and Complaint, by Deli; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMessage: PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMessage: Order RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMessage: Order INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 04/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 18; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Edward Richards; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Asbestos Filed (Amended); Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOSHIBA INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MUELLER STREAM SPECIALITY is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIED HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING CO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GASKET ENGINEERING AND MACHINE is a litigant