This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 02:02:53 (UTC).

Reynolds VS W.C.C.S., Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 Reynolds filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against W C C S , Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WINIFRED Y. SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9294

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REYNOLDS, ROBERT

Defendant

W.C.C.S., INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FILMUS, ILYA

HOLMES, LAUREL N.

GEMOETS, TRAVIS M.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/6/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/6/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

7/2/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/5/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/5/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/19/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/19/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/13/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/13/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

8/11/2021: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

4/29/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

1/25/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for W.C.C.S., Inc.

12/16/2020: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for W.C.C.S., Inc.

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

1/13/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - RE: First Amended Complaint

1/19/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - RE: First Amended Complaint

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

10/6/2020: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement of Robert Reynolds Filed

10/6/2020: Case Management Statement of Robert Reynolds Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for W.C.C.S., Inc.

9/14/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for W.C.C.S., Inc.

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Winifred Y. Smith; Department: Dept 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 10/27/2021 10:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Winifred Y. Smith; Department: Dept 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 07/06/2021 10:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to W.C.C.S., Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to W.C.C.S., Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - for Approval of Complex Designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 10/13/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 09/09/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Reynolds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where W.C.C.S., INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLMES, LAUREL N.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEMOETS TRAVIS MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FILMUS, ILYA