This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/14/2023 at 09:58:08 (UTC).

REYNOLDS, et al. vs EZRICARE, LLC, et al.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 REYNOLDS, filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against EZRICARE, LLC,. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Eumi Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8265

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Eumi Lee

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

"DOE" AMAZON DELIVERY SERVICE PARTNER

AMAZON.COM, INC.

ARU PHARMA, INC.

DANAE REYNOLDS

EZRICARE, LLC

EZRIRX, LLC

GLOBAL PHARMA HEALTHCARE PRIVATE LIMITED

MILTON REYNOLDS

Michael A. Akselrud

 

Court Documents

Complaint

02/22/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/22/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons on Complaint

02/22/2023: Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

02/22/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment

02/22/2023: Notice of Case Assignment

Request for Dismissal

03/20/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

04/05/2023: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketMessage: The case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by: EZRICARE, LLC (Defendant); EZRIRX, LLC (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketMessage: Request for Dismissal Filed by: MILTON REYNOLDS (Plaintiff); DANAE REYNOLDS (Plaintiff) As to: ARU PHARMA, INC. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketMessage: On the Complaint filed by MILTON REYNOLDS, et al. on 02/22/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by MILTON REYNOLDS and DANAE REYNOLDS as to ARU PHARMA, INC.; Category: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketMessage: Case assigned to Hon. Eumi Lee in Department 512 Hayward Hall of Justice; Category: Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/10/2023 at 09:30 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 512; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: MILTON REYNOLDS (Plaintiff); DANAE REYNOLDS (Plaintiff) As to: EZRICARE, LLC (Defendant); EZRIRX, LLC (Defendant); GLOBAL PHARMA HEALTHCARE PRIVATE LIMITED (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: MILTON REYNOLDS (Plaintiff); DANAE REYNOLDS (Plaintiff) As to: EZRICARE, LLC (Defendant); EZRIRX, LLC (Defendant); GLOBAL PHARMA HEALTHCARE PRIVATE LIMITED (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Filed by: MILTON REYNOLDS (Plaintiff); DANAE REYNOLDS (Plaintiff) As to: EZRICARE, LLC (Defendant); EZRIRX, LLC (Defendant); GLOBAL PHARMA HEALTHCARE PRIVATE LIMITED (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less