This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/18/2021 at 02:56:24 (UTC).

Reyes v. Luxury Motors of Bay Area

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Reyes filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Luxury Motors of Bay Area. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2036

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REYES, MONICA

ORTIZ-REYES, FRANCISCO

Defendants

SURETY

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

LUXURY MOTORS OF BAY AREA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SADR, KASRA

CASE, ANTHONY T.

SCHELEY III, L THEODORE

TOMLIN, TIMOTHY J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Other Contract Filed

8/25/2020: Complaint - Other Contract Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Janett S McCoy

8/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Janett S McCoy

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

8/25/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

9/10/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 03/16/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

9/10/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 03/16/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

9/18/2020: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Luxury Motors of Bay Area LLC Filed

10/20/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Luxury Motors of Bay Area LLC Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Great American Insurance Company Filed

10/20/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Great American Insurance Company Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Luxury Motors of Bay Area LLC

12/16/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Luxury Motors of Bay Area LLC

Case Management Statement of Monica Reyes, Francisco Ortiz-Reyes Filed

3/16/2021: Case Management Statement of Monica Reyes, Francisco Ortiz-Reyes Filed

Case Management Statement of Great American Insurance Company Filed

3/8/2021: Case Management Statement of Great American Insurance Company Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Great American Insurance Company

3/8/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Great American Insurance Company

Case Management Statement of Luxury Motors of Bay Area LLC Filed

3/4/2021: Case Management Statement of Luxury Motors of Bay Area LLC Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Luxury Motors of Bay Area LLC

3/3/2021: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Luxury Motors of Bay Area LLC

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Luxury Motors of Bay Area LLC

1/19/2021: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Luxury Motors of Bay Area LLC

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Monica Reyes, Francisco Ortiz-Reyes Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Great American Insurance Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Great American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Luxury Motors of Bay Area LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Luxury Motors of Bay Area LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Luxury Motors of Bay Area LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Luxury Motors of Bay Area LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Luxury Motors of Bay Area LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Great American Insurance Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/16/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Janett S McCoy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Contract Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURETY is a litigant

Latest cases where Great American Insurance Company of New York is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASE ANTHONY T.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHELEY III, L THEODORE