This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 03:55:31 (UTC).

RENOVATION REALITY, INC VS NICORA

Case Summary

On 06/11/2018 RENOVATION REALITY, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NICORA. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS HAYASHI and THOMAS RASCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8254

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

DENNIS HAYASHI

THOMAS RASCH

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

RENOVATION REALITY, INC

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

NICORA, WILLIAM

SULLIVAN, NICHOLAS PATRICK

SULLIVAN, CHARA

BORDESSA, JAKE

DELGADO, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCHULZ, PETER J.

GUMBINER, JOEL P.

JONES, JAIMEE A.

BURKE, JOHN A.

ACREE, MARISSA N.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/9/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/20/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/20/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conf Continuance 06/19/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

6/4/2020: Case Management Conf Continuance 06/19/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/19/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/19/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/25/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/25/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 10/26/2018 02:30 PM D- 518

6/12/2018: Initial Case Management Conference 10/26/2018 02:30 PM D- 518

Reply to Opposition to Judgment on the Pleadings Filed

8/11/2021: Reply to Opposition to Judgment on the Pleadings Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

8/12/2021: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Defendants/Cross-Complainants Sullivans' Proposed Statement of the Case Filed

5/26/2021: Defendants/Cross-Complainants Sullivans' Proposed Statement of the Case Filed

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

5/28/2021: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

5/11/2020: Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

Objections to Evidence Filed for RENOVATION REALITY, INC

5/4/2020: Objections to Evidence Filed for RENOVATION REALITY, INC

Motion for Summary Judgment Taken Under Submission

3/12/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment Taken Under Submission

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

10/11/2018: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Notice of of entry of default Filed

9/7/2018: Notice of of entry of default Filed

186 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Judge: Dennis Hayashi; Department: Dept 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Judgment on the Pleadings Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Judgment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Judgment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Judgment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 08/19/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
232 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to MICHAEL DELGADO Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to JAKE BORDESSA Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for NICHOLAS PATRICK SULLIVAN, CHARA SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for NICHOLAS PATRICK SULLIVAN, CHARA SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/26/2018 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for RENOVATION REALITY, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RENOVATION REALITY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUMBINER, JOEL P.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ACREE, MARISSA N.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURKE, JOHN A