This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/16/2020 at 00:14:59 (UTC).

RCL Holdings VS Bailey

Case Summary

On 10/16/1998 RCL Holdings filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Bailey. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Wiley W Manuel Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JUDITH FORD and TALLY CRAIG - PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0476

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/1998

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JUDITH FORD

TALLY CRAIG - PORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

RCL HOLDINGS

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

BAILEY, WILLIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AMMON, BARRY D

 

Court Documents

Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

10/16/1998: Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

Application Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to Willis Bailey Granted

10/26/1998: Application Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to Willis Bailey Granted

Answer To Complaint Filed for Willis Bailey

10/26/1998: Answer To Complaint Filed for Willis Bailey

Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

10/29/1998: Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

11/24/1998: Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Completed

12/2/1998: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

12/2/1998: Judgment Entered

Returned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

12/9/1998: Returned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Notice of Change of Address Filed

12/16/1998: Notice of Change of Address Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed for RCL Holdings

12/28/1998: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed for RCL Holdings

Declaration of Barry D. Ammon in Oppositin to Request for Stay of Execution Filed

12/31/1998: Declaration of Barry D. Ammon in Oppositin to Request for Stay of Execution Filed

Letter re FROM SHERIFF -- COPY OF WRIT ISSUED IN ERROR Filed

12/31/1998: Letter re FROM SHERIFF -- COPY OF WRIT ISSUED IN ERROR Filed

Order To Quash and Recall Writ of Execution Filed

12/31/1998: Order To Quash and Recall Writ of Execution Filed

Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed

1/5/1999: Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed

Stipulation and Order Re: Entry of Judgment Granted

1/7/1999: Stipulation and Order Re: Entry of Judgment Granted

Writ of Possession - Unsatisfied Filed

1/7/1999: Writ of Possession - Unsatisfied Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Entry of Judgment Filed for RCL Holdings

1/7/1999: Stipulation and Order Re: Entry of Judgment Filed for RCL Holdings

Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed

2/24/1999: Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession - Satisfied Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/1999
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Entry of Judgment Filed for RCL Holdings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession - Unsatisfied Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Entry of Judgment Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/1999
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Judgment; Judge: Tally Craig - Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/1999
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 14 date: 01/07/1999 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/1999
  • DocketMotion to Vacate/Set Aside Judgment -Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/1998
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Judith Ford; Department: Dept 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/1998
  • DocketHearing Continued to Unlawful Detainer Court Trial dept: 2 date: 12/02/1998 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Court Trial 11/18/1998 09:00 AM D- 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer To Complaint Filed for Willis Bailey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to Willis Bailey Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/1998
  • DocketApplication Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed for Willis Bailey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/1998
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less