Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 19:17:02 (UTC).

Raven Greene LLC VS Indigo Dye Group Corp.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 Raven Greene LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Indigo Dye Group Corp. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DELBERT C. GEE and STEPHEN KAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8214

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

DELBERT C. GEE

STEPHEN KAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

RAVEN GREENE LLC

ROES 1-10

GREENE , JENNIFER

RAVEN , CHARLES

RAJCS INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

INDIGO DYE GROUP CORP.

WALKER, EMILY

WAREHOUSE WAY ASSOCIATES, LTD. I

WALKER, CLINTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RIDLESS, JOSHUA A.

WALKER, DONALD G.

PERRY, CHARLES R.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/16/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

7/13/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/12/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/12/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

3/9/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/10/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/10/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

11/5/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/10/2020 03:00 PM D- 514

10/19/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/10/2020 03:00 PM D- 514

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

2/19/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Motion Denied

9/22/2020: Motion Denied

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

8/25/2020: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

9/2/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed

8/5/2020: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/24/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

6/12/2020: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

Summons on Cross Complaint Issued

1/21/2020: Summons on Cross Complaint Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Raven Greene LLC

10/7/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Raven Greene LLC

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 10/20/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Raven Greene LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Indigo Dye Group Corp., Clinton Walker, Emily Walker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Indigo Dye Group Corp., Clinton Walker, Emily Walker, Warehouse Way As

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 02/25/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Raven Greene LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WAREHOUSE WAY ASSOCIATES, LTD. I is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALKER, DONALD G.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIDLESS JOSHUA A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERRY, CHARLES R.