This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/07/2020 at 01:56:12 (UTC).

Ramirez VS Winland

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 Ramirez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Winland. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3828

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ, PATRICIA CABRERA

Defendants

ALLIED UNIVERSAL, LLC

SOUTHLAND MALL, L.P.

ROUSE PROPERTIES, LLC

WINLAND, JOHN DAVID

ROUSE PROPERTIES, INC.

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROBINSON, RALPH W

LAURICELLA, JOAN M.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

12/10/2019: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Patricia Cabrera Ramirez

9/10/2019: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Patricia Cabrera Ramirez

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Southland Mall, L.P.

9/27/2019: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Southland Mall, L.P.

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Rouse Properties, LLC

9/27/2019: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Rouse Properties, LLC

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/15/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/15/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Brookfield Properties Retail Group Filed

7/31/2019: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Brookfield Properties Retail Group Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for John David Winland, Allied Universal, LLC

7/9/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for John David Winland, Allied Universal, LLC

Case Management Statement of Southland Mall, L.P. , Rouse Properties, LLC Filed

6/3/2019: Case Management Statement of Southland Mall, L.P. , Rouse Properties, LLC Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/10/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/10/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Southland Mall, L.P. , Rouse Properties, LLC

3/22/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Southland Mall, L.P. , Rouse Properties, LLC

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Rouse Properties, LLC Filed

3/7/2019: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Rouse Properties, LLC Filed

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

3/7/2019: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

3/7/2019: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to John David Winland Filed

2/21/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to John David Winland Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 06/10/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

2/28/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 06/10/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/28/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 01/07/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Rouse Properties, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Southland Mall, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Patricia Cabrera Ramirez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Brookfield Properties Retail Group Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Rouse Properties, LLC Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/10/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to John David Winland Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Rouse Properties, LLC Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Allied Universal, LLC Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Southland Mall, L.P. Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Patricia Cabrera Ramirez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rouse Properties TRS, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHLAND MALL, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIED UNIVERSAL, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant