Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 19:54:30 (UTC).

Ramirez VS Ramirez

Case Summary

On 05/09/2003 Ramirez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Ramirez. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH HENDRICKSON, JACOB BLEA III, EILEEN PREVILLE and CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5808

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

ELIZABETH HENDRICKSON

JACOB BLEA III

EILEEN PREVILLE

CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAMIREZ, VALERIE

Respondent

RAMIREZ, GILBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MILLER, EDWARD S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2006
  • DocketWithdrawal of Attorney Filed for Valerie Ramirez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2006
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial - Family Law Hearing Dropped from dept: 707 date: 03/01/2006 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2006
  • DocketSettlement Conference - Family Law Hearing Dropped from dept: 707 date: 02/23/2006 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2006
  • DocketSummons with Proof of Service As to Gilbert Ramirez Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2006
  • DocketHearing Reset to Settlement Conference - Family Law 02/23/2006 09:00 AM D- 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2006
  • DocketMinutes: Order to Show Cause re; Judge: Jacob Blea III; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2006
  • DocketMiscellaneous Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2006
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations, and Waivers Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2006
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution Granted Effective on 01/04/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2006
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2004
  • DocketCase Status Questionaire of Valerie Ramirez Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2004
  • DocketStatus Report Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2004
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address of Counsel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2003
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Trial Setting Conference Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2003
  • DocketSettlement Conference - Family Law 02/25/2004 02:30 PM D- 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2003
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum Filed for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2003
  • DocketResponse to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed for Gilbert Ramirez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2003
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2003
  • DocketSummons on Petition Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2003
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed

    Read MoreRead Less