This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 22:16:10 (UTC).

Ramirez VS Minevich

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 Ramirez filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Minevich. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS HAYASHI, HARRY JACOBS and HON. Dennis Hayashi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8900

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

DENNIS HAYASHI

HARRY JACOBS

HON. Dennis Hayashi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAMIREZ, LARYSSA

Laryssa Ramirez

Defendants

ST. ROSE HOSPITAL

MINEVICH, GREGORY MD

MINEVICH MD, GREGORY PC

HAYWARD SISTERS HOSPITAL

Gregory Minevich MD, PC

Gregory Minevich, MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MCMAHAN, CARL AUSTIN

TABARI, CYRUS A.

STILL, THOMAS E.

Carl Austin McMahan

Cyrus A. Tabari

Thomas E. Still

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/30/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and Related Dates

05/25/2022: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and Related Dates

Notice Demand for Exchange of Expert Witness Information

05/17/2022: Notice Demand for Exchange of Expert Witness Information

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

05/03/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

04/29/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

03/04/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

03/11/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/12/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes

09/02/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes

Declaration of Service by Mail

02/24/2020: Declaration of Service by Mail

Civil OSC Commenced and Completed

10/08/2021: Civil OSC Commenced and Completed

Declaration In Response To OSC Filed

09/27/2021: Declaration In Response To OSC Filed

Declaration in Response to OSC Re Mandatory Settlement Conference Filed

09/21/2021: Declaration in Response to OSC Re Mandatory Settlement Conference Filed

Declaration in Response to OSC Re Mandatory Settlement Conference Filed

09/16/2021: Declaration in Response to OSC Re Mandatory Settlement Conference Filed

Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference

09/02/2021: Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

09/02/2021: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 09/02/2021 02:00 PM D- 302 Per Judge Jacobs - no appearance were made at scheduled MSC hearing. Dept.302 did not receive any MSC statements and no communication from any party was given prior to the start of the

09/02/2021: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 09/02/2021 02:00 PM D- 302 Per Judge Jacobs - no appearance were made at scheduled MSC hearing. Dept.302 did not receive any MSC statements and no communication from any party was given prior to the start of the hear

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and Related Dates Filed and Received by: Laryssa Ramirez (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice Demand for Exchange of Expert Witness Information Filed by: Laryssa Ramirez (Plaintiff) As to: Gregory Minevich, MD (Defendant); Gregory Minevich MD, PC (Defendant); Hayward Sisters Hospital (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by: Hayward Sisters Hospital (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketMessage: On the Complaint filed by Ramirez on 10/11/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Laryssa Ramirez as to Hayward Sisters Hospital; Category: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketMessage: Request for Dismissal Filed by: Laryssa Ramirez (Plaintiff) As to: Hayward Sisters Hospital (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketMessage: On the Complaint filed by Ramirez on 10/11/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Laryssa Ramirez as to Hayward Sisters Hospital; Category: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Address for Cyrus A. Tabari (Attorney) null; Category: Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Cyrus A. Tabari (Attorney):Organization Name changed from SHEUERMAN, MARTINI & TABARI to SHEUERMAN, MARTINI ,TABARI & GARVINName Suffix: blank; Category: Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Address for Cyrus A. Tabari (Attorney) updated; Category: Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by: Cyrus A. Tabari (Attorney); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketMessage: Summons Issued and Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketMessage: Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted; Category: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 02/24/2020 02:30 PM D- 518; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketMessage: Posting of Jury Fees Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Laryssa Ramirez; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Laryssa Ramirez; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. ROSE HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where HAYWARD SISTERS HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCMAHAN CARL AUSTIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Still, Thomas E.