This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 00:38:37 (UTC).

Rahmanzai VS Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a Calif

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Rahmanzai filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a Calif. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD SEABOLT and C. DON CLAY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6946

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

RICHARD SEABOLT

C. DON CLAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAHMANZAI , MANILLA

Defendant

WASHINGTON HOSPITAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, A CALIFORNIA LOCAL HEALTH CARE DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MORONEY, LINDA M

RUDOLPH, SAMUEL B.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/30/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/30/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

7/1/2021: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/30/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

Tentative Case Management Order

8/26/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/18/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Reply Memorandum ISO Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Filed

8/6/2021: Reply Memorandum ISO Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Filed

Hearing Reset to Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication 09/15/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

8/11/2021: Hearing Reset to Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication 09/15/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

Case Management Statement of Manilla Rahmanzai Filed

8/12/2021: Case Management Statement of Manilla Rahmanzai Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Stipulated Protective Order

10/5/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Stipulated Protective Order

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

10/15/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/28/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

6/15/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/18/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Manilla Rahmanzai Filed

3/10/2020: Case Management Statement of Manilla Rahmanzai Filed

Case Management Statement of Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a California local health care d

3/12/2020: Case Management Statement of Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a California local health care d

Case Management Statement of Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a California local health care d

11/14/2019: Case Management Statement of Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a California local health care d

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a California local healt

9/18/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a California local healt

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/15/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Complaint - Other Employment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketTR - Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication - Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication 10/07/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/08/2022 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 08/26/2022 10:00 AM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 06/02/2022 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a California local health care d

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Manilla Rahmanzai Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration regarding good faith attempt to Meet and Confer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a California local healt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/27/2019 03:00 PM D- 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Manilla Rahmanzai

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WASHINGTON HOSPITAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, A CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUDOLPH, SAMUEL B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moroney, Linda Moin