This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/31/2021 at 04:48:27 (UTC).

Quinteros VS Snelling Employment,LLC

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 Quinteros filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Snelling Employment,LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EVELIO GRILLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8931

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

EVELIO GRILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUINTEROS , ROSA

Defendants

SNELLING EMPLOYMENT,LLC

DONSUEMOR,INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TANOUYE ESQ, ADAM K

MARTIN, JONATHAN D

DEBACKER, JEANINE D

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/19/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/19/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

5/24/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Case Management Statement of Rosa Quinteros Filed

12/30/2020: Case Management Statement of Rosa Quinteros Filed

Case Management Statement of Rosa Quinteros Filed

7/17/2020: Case Management Statement of Rosa Quinteros Filed

Case Management Statement of Rosa Quinteros Filed

7/17/2020: Case Management Statement of Rosa Quinteros Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Donsuemor,Inc.

5/11/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Donsuemor,Inc.

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/29/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Snelling Employment,LLC

3/6/2020: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Snelling Employment,LLC

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

2/3/2020: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/29/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

First Amended Complaint Filed

1/29/2020: First Amended Complaint Filed

Case Management Statement of Snelling Employment,LLC Filed

1/14/2020: Case Management Statement of Snelling Employment,LLC Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7/29/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Ronni MacLaren Filed for Rosa Quinteros

8/2/2019: Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Ronni MacLaren Filed for Rosa Quinteros

Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Ronni MacLaren Granted

8/2/2019: Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Ronni MacLaren Granted

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 12/11/2019 09:15 AM D- 15

8/2/2019: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 12/11/2019 09:15 AM D- 15

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/26/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for Rosa Quinteros

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/15/2021 01:30 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Snelling Employment,LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Donsuemor,Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Rosa Quinteros Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Snelling Employment,LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 12/11/2019 09:15 AM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Ronni MacLaren Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Ronni MacLaren Filed for Rosa Quinteros

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/10/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Rosa Quinteros

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Snelling Employment, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TANOUYE, ADAM K.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN, JONATHAN D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEBACKER, JEANINE D.