This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 03:49:35 (UTC).

Proctor VS Wu

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Proctor filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wu. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN KAUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5652

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN KAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROCTOR, KATHERINE

Defendants

WU, HAO

YUAN, MIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEE, LARRY

WU, SAM X. J.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/20/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/20/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/20/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/19/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/19/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

1/13/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/25/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/25/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

5/6/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

Order Filed

2/24/2021: Order Filed

Declaration ISO Opposition to Motion for Protective Order Filed

3/12/2021: Declaration ISO Opposition to Motion for Protective Order Filed

Motion For Protective Order Re: Written Discovery - Motion Rescheduled

3/24/2021: Motion For Protective Order Re: Written Discovery - Motion Rescheduled

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

4/5/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Hao Wu, Min Yuan

7/8/2020: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Hao Wu, Min Yuan

Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

6/19/2020: Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Katherine Proctor

2/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Katherine Proctor

First Amended Complaint Filed

1/27/2020: First Amended Complaint Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

12/4/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Notice of Court Mediation Referral Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Court Mediation Referral Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Kaus; Department: Dept 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 05/18/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketReferred to Court Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion For Protective Order Re: Written Discovery; Judge: Stephen Kaus; Department: Dept 19

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Katherine Proctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/21/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Katherine Proctor Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Katherine Proctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Katherine Proctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE, LARRY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WU SAM X.J.