This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 04:28:33 (UTC).

PRL Glass Systems, Inc. VS American Glazing & Aluminum

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 PRL Glass Systems, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against American Glazing Aluminum. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2959

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRL GLASS SYSTEMS, INC.

Defendants

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

AMERICAN GLAZING & ALUMINUM

GARNER, LISA RAE

LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY

TELEGRAPH 2 NEUN OWNER. LLC

THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

NG, CHRISTOPHER E.

 

Court Documents

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

7/27/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

6/28/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for PRL Glass Systems, Inc.

6/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for PRL Glass Systems, Inc.

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/28/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Lis Pendens Filed

7/1/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 12/28/2021 03:00 PM D- 20

7/2/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 12/28/2021 03:00 PM D- 20

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7/2/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

First Amended Complaint Filed

7/7/2021: First Amended Complaint Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

7/7/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 20; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/28/2021 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for PRL Glass Systems, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRL GLASS SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN GLAZING & ALUMINUM is a litigant

Latest cases where LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant