Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 18:43:02 (UTC).

Prisco VS Prisco

Case Summary

On 07/02/2004 Prisco filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Prisco. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH HENDRICKSON, ALICE VILARDI, JACOB BLEA III and CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3742

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

ELIZABETH HENDRICKSON

ALICE VILARDI

JACOB BLEA III

CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PRISCO, FRANK J. JR

Respondent

PRISCO, SUSAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RYAN, KATHERINE VERNON

SAGARIA, SCOTT J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2007
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2007
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Alice Vilardi; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution Granted Effective on 03/15/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial - Family Law Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution Request Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2007
  • DocketMinutes: Settlement Conference; Judge: Alice Vilardi; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2007
  • DocketSettlement Conference - Family Law Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2007
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2006
  • DocketHearing Reset to Non-Jury Trial - Family Law 03/15/2007 01:30 PM D- 707

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2004
  • DocketResponse to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed for Susan Prisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2004
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Petition for Dissolution of Marriage As to Susan Prisco Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2004
  • DocketMinutes: Temporary Restraining Order and Notice of Hearing; Judge: Elizabeth Hendrickson; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2004
  • DocketDomestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2004
  • DocketDomestic Violence Hearing 08/04/2004 02:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2004
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2004
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order and Notice of Hearing Filed for Frank J. Prisco Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2004
  • DocketRequest for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Filed for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2004
  • DocketSummons on Petition Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2004
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed

    Read MoreRead Less