This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/11/2020 at 11:03:09 (UTC).

Powell VS Barfield

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 Powell filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Barfield. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PATRICK R. MCKINNEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5436

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

PATRICK R. MCKINNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

POWELL, ANTHONY

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

BARFIELD , WAYNETT C

 

Court Documents

Returned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

9/27/2019: Returned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

9/13/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

9/13/2019: Judgment Entered

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

7/22/2019: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

7/2/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Patrick R. McKinney; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 09/13/2019 09:00 AM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Anthony Powell Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Anthony Powell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 09/13/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less