This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 16:56:04 (UTC).

Poole VS 3M Company

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 Poole filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Jo-Lynne Lee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0984

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Jo-Lynne Lee

 

Party Details

Defendants

FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.

ALTA BUILDING MATERIALS CO

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC.

GRINNELL LLC

MOHASO CORPORATION

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

FUTURE PIPE INDUSTRIES, INC.

DOUGLAS INSULATION CO., INC.

C.S. HARDEMAN, INC.

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

ABCO MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC

ROBERTSON-CECO II CORPORATION

ALGOMA HARDWOODS, INC.

SOCO-WEST, INC.

MARCONI PLASTERING CO. INC.

3M COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

SCOTT COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC.

40 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

05/20/2022: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

05/20/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice NOTICE OF RESOLUTION OF CASE AND REQUEST TO VACATE TRIAL DATE AND SET STATUS CONFERENCE

05/20/2022: Notice NOTICE OF RESOLUTION OF CASE AND REQUEST TO VACATE TRIAL DATE AND SET STATUS CONFERENCE

Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) (*Judge's Memo to Clerk - PTSC: Case settled in Part - Cahill & Pierce Lathing Company))

05/12/2022: Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) (*Judge's Memo to Clerk - PTSC: Case settled in Part - Cahill & Pierce Lathing Company))

Minute Order (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))

05/12/2022: Minute Order (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

05/05/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

05/05/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

05/05/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

05/02/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

04/08/2022: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

03/25/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

03/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

03/24/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Case Management Statement

03/23/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIAS NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OFF CALENDAR

03/08/2022: Notice DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIAS NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OFF CALENDAR

Notice of Change of Firm Name

02/22/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice Notice of Remote Appearance

02/18/2022: Notice Notice of Remote Appearance

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

02/04/2022: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

679 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Jury Trial scheduled for 06/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 05/20/2022; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/20/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18 updated: Result Date to 05/20/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Oran Poole (Plaintiff); Jacqueline Poole (Plaintiff) As to: Designated Defense Counsel (Other Third Party); Massachusetts Bay insurance Company (Other Third Party); Maryland Casualty Company (Other Third Party) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice NOTICE OF RESOLUTION OF CASE AND REQUEST TO VACATE TRIAL DATE AND SET STATUS CONFERENCE Filed by: Oran Poole (Plaintiff); Jacqueline Poole (Plaintiff) As to: Designated Defense Counsel (Other Third Party); Massachusetts Bay insurance Company (Other Third Party); Maryland Casualty Company (Other Third Party) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 05/12/2022 at 11:00 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 301 updated: Result Date to 05/12/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMessage: Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) (*Judge's Memo to Clerk - PTSC: Case settled in Part - Cahill & Pierce Lathing Company)) Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Oran Poole (Plaintiff); Jacqueline Poole (Plaintiff) As to: Designated Defense Counsel (Other Third Party); Massachusetts Bay insurance Company (Other Third Party); Maryland Casualty Company (Other Third Party) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
663 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketMessage: Order Re Designated Defense Counsel Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketMessage: Preliminary Fact Sheet Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketMessage: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 07/26/2019 09:15 AM D- 23; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketMessage: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 07/23/2019 03:00 PM D- 23; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Oran Poole; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Asbestos Filed (Amended); Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less