This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/11/2022 at 16:36:29 (UTC).

PMGI, LLC VS Goiveia

Case Summary

On 02/04/2010 PMGI, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Goiveia. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7599

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

PMGI, LLC

Kenneth J. Miele

Paulo Gouveia

 

Court Documents

Proposed Judgment Request

05/03/2010: Proposed Judgment Request

Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request

05/03/2010: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request

Declaration Re: Lost Original Documents Request

05/03/2010: Declaration Re: Lost Original Documents Request

Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Request

05/03/2010: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Request

Declaration of Costs Request

05/03/2010: Declaration of Costs Request

Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Request

05/03/2010: Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Request

Declaration Request

05/03/2010: Declaration Request

Declaration Other: Request

05/03/2010: Declaration Other: Request

Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for PMGI, LLC

04/26/2021: Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for PMGI, LLC

Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for PMGI, LLC

12/07/2020: Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for PMGI, LLC

Proof of Service on Renewal of Judgment Filed

07/27/2020: Proof of Service on Renewal of Judgment Filed

Judgment Entered

02/14/2020: Judgment Entered

Application and Renewal of Judgment Filed

02/14/2020: Application and Renewal of Judgment Filed

Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for PMGI, LLC

02/14/2020: Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for PMGI, LLC

Judgment Entered judgment granted and entered

06/21/2010: Judgment Entered judgment granted and entered

Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Paulo Gouveia Filed Filing request for default 585 judgment

05/03/2010: Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Paulo Gouveia Filed Filing request for default 585 judgment

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Paulo Goiveia Filed

02/24/2010: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Paulo Goiveia Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for PMGI, LLC

02/18/2010: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for PMGI, LLC

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketMessage: Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for PMGI, LLC; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketMessage: Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for PMGI, LLC; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Renewal of Judgment Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMessage: Judgment Entered; Category: Entry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMessage: Application and Renewal of Judgment Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMessage: Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for PMGI, LLC; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • DocketMessage: Paper File Destroyed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • DocketMessage: Abstract of Judgment Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • DocketMessage: Judgment Entered; Category: Entry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketMessage: Declaration Request; Category: DCL041

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketMessage: Declaration Other: Request; Category: DCL011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketMessage: Default Entered as to Paulo Gouveia. Judgment Routed to Judge; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Paulo Gouveia Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Paulo Goiveia Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for PMGI, LLC; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • DocketMessage: Summons Issued and Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • DocketMessage: First Amended Complaint Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Collections Filed (Amended); Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PMGI LLC is a litigant