Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/02/2020 at 02:58:23 (UTC).

Plum Manor Home Owners Association VS Thompson

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 Plum Manor Home Owners Association filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Thompson. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JO-LYNNE Q. LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1403

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLUM MANOR HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

BETTER HOMES REALTY

THOMPSON, ENA

MAISEL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MCKEOWN, FRANCIS M

CHOLAKIAN, KEVIN K

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

1/29/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

12/6/2019: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/04/2020 08:30 AM D- 514

12/9/2019: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/04/2020 08:30 AM D- 514

Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 09/18/2020 09:00 AM D- 514

12/9/2019: Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 09/18/2020 09:00 AM D- 514

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/6/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/6/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for Ena Thompson, Maisel Property Management, Inc.

5/22/2019: Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for Ena Thompson, Maisel Property Management, Inc.

First Amended Complaint Filed

4/5/2019: First Amended Complaint Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

4/8/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/10/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 07/31/2019 03:00 PM D- 18

3/19/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 07/31/2019 03:00 PM D- 18

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

3/19/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Plum Manor Home Owners Association

3/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Plum Manor Home Owners Association

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

3/18/2019: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3/18/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 09/18/2020 09:00 AM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/04/2020 08:30 AM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jo-Lynne Q. Lee; Department: Dept 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketReferred to Private Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 05/01/2020 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 09/14/2020 08:30 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Amended Complaint Filed for Ena Thompson, Maisel Property Management, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/06/2019 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/31/2019 03:00 PM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Plum Manor Home Owners Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAISEL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCKEOWN, FRANCIS M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOLAKIAN, KEVIN K.