Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/15/2020 at 00:22:31 (UTC).

Piper VS Cordis Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/15/2017 Piper filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Cordis Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAD SELIGMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5485

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRAD SELIGMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PIPER, RICHARD

CALHOUN, MOSES

ROSKOSZ, WILLIAM

ELDRIDGE DUNFORD AND CAROLYN DUNFORD

DEBOSE, MIKER

FRAUENHOFFER, GEORGE

VELIZ, CONSUELO

WILLIAMS, FREDERICK

HART, PEARLINA

LIPSCOMB, EUNIDA

BREUER, ERIC

RICHARDSON, ALESIA

GARNSEY, MARION

PEGRAM, ROD

GUERRERO, MARTHA

HAYHURST, JACK

CLAYBORN, MELANY

RICHARD PIPER AND DEBRA PIPER

ERIC BREUER AND DANIELLE AUCLAIR

Defendant

CORDIS CORPORATION

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LOPEZ, MATTHEW RAMON

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/28/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/19/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/19/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/9/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/9/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/2/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/2/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/30/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/30/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Complaint - Product Liability Filed

9/15/2017: Complaint - Product Liability Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Richard Piper

9/15/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Richard Piper

Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

9/27/2017: Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

9/28/2017: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Johnson & Johnson Filed

10/17/2017: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Johnson & Johnson Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Confluent Medical Technologies, Inc. Filed

10/17/2017: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Confluent Medical Technologies, Inc. Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Alesia Richardson Filed

11/20/2017: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Alesia Richardson Filed

Dismissal As to Plaintiff: Alesia Richardson Entered

12/8/2017: Dismissal As to Plaintiff: Alesia Richardson Entered

First Amended Complaint Filed

6/13/2018: First Amended Complaint Filed

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/13/2020 03:02 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/03/2020 01:32 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/10/2020 01:32 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/26/2019 03:02 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/17/2019 03:02 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/25/2019 03:02 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/23/2019 03:32 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/29/2019 03:32 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/03/2019 02:32 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/05/2019 09:17 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 10/10/2017 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 22 date: 01/30/2018 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/30/2018 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Richard Piper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Product Liability Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORDIS CORPORATION, a Johnson & Johnson Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOPEZ, MATTHEW RAMON