This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 07:44:57 (UTC).

Pine VS Hallway Healthcare, Inc ., a California corporation

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Pine filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Hallway Healthcare, Inc , a California corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4140

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINE , CINDY FLORES

Defendant

HALLWAY HEALTHCARE, INC ., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MELMED, JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference 11/24/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

9/29/2021: Case Management Conference 11/24/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Cindy Flores Pine

9/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Cindy Flores Pine

Complaint - Other Employment Filed

9/16/2021: Complaint - Other Employment Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/16/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Complaint - Other Employment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 11/24/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 10/27/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Cindy Flores Pine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELMED, JONATHAN