This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/22/2021 at 04:45:03 (UTC).

Picart VS Horrigan Cole Enterprises INC, a California Corpor

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Picart filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Horrigan Cole Enterprises INC, a California Corpor. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0479

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PICART, ANDREA

Defendants

HORRIGAN COLE ENTERPRISES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CALIFORNIA MENTOR, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BROOKS, MICHAEL

COYLE, DANIEL J.

 

Court Documents

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/06/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

3/8/2021: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/06/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

3/5/2021: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

3/5/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 10/06/2021 03:00 PM D- 20

3/5/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 10/06/2021 03:00 PM D- 20

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

2/23/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrea Picart

2/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrea Picart

Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

2/23/2021: Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to California Mentor, a business organization form unknown Filed

3/26/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to California Mentor, a business organization form unknown Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Horrigan Cole Enterprises INC, a California Corporation Filed

3/26/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Horrigan Cole Enterprises INC, a California Corporation Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Horrigan Cole Enterprises INC, a California Corporation

4/16/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Horrigan Cole Enterprises INC, a California Corporation

Proof of Service on Complaint As to California Mentor, a business organization form unknown Filed

4/15/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to California Mentor, a business organization form unknown Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Horrigan Cole Enterprises INC, a California Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to California Mentor, a business organization form unknown Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to California Mentor, a business organization form unknown Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Horrigan Cole Enterprises INC, a California Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/06/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/06/2021 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrea Picart

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Horrigan Cole Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brooks, Michael