Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 15:43:57 (UTC).

Performance Plus Plumbing VS Allen

Case Summary

On 04/10/2009 Performance Plus Plumbing filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Allen. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN PORTER and BEVERLY M. HOEY, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6435

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOHN PORTER

BEVERLY M. HOEY, PORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Debtor / Appellee

PERFORMANCE PLUS PLUMBING

Defendant and Other

ALLEN, RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

4/10/2009: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

4/14/2009: Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

6/10/2009: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

6/10/2009: Judgment Entered

Motion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment Filed

7/8/2009: Motion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment Filed

Hearing Reset to Motion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment 07/22/2009 09:00 AM D- 702

7/8/2009: Hearing Reset to Motion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment 07/22/2009 09:00 AM D- 702

Small Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

7/22/2009: Small Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

Small Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

9/9/2009: Small Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2009
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment; Judge: John Porter; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • DocketMotion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment; Judge: John Porter; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Law and Motion dept: 702 date: 09/09/2009 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Motion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment 07/22/2009 09:00 AM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • DocketSmall Claims Law and Motion 07/22/2009 02:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Beverly M. Hoey, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Defendant on Claim of Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 06/10/2009 09:00 AM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less