This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/08/2021 at 02:49:53 (UTC).

Perez VS Lee

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 Perez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Lee. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are REBEKAH EVENSON and JOSCELYN JONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7179

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

REBEKAH EVENSON

JOSCELYN JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ, MARIA

Defendant

LEE, CHI K

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

9/26/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Request to Postpone Trial Filed

11/25/2019: Request to Postpone Trial Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/01/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

3/18/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/01/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

7/1/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

5/11/2020: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

8/7/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 11/09/2020 09:00 AM D- 105

9/4/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 11/09/2020 09:00 AM D- 105

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

11/9/2020: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

11/9/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Informal Correspondence to / from Received

12/2/2020: Informal Correspondence to / from Received

Notice of Change of Address Filed

12/2/2020: Notice of Change of Address Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformal Correspondence to / from Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Joscelyn Jones; Department: Dept 105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 11/09/2020 09:00 AM D- 105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Rebekah Evenson; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 519 date: 11/24/2020 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Rebekah Evenson; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 519 date: 08/07/2020 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/01/2020 08:45 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/01/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 04/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 12/12/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less