This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 23:19:23 (UTC).

Perez VS Curtiss-Wright Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 Perez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Curtiss-Wright Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Tara Desautels. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9747

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Tara Desautels

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andy Perez

Defendant

CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Edwin Alwazian

Kathleen Brenna Roney

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 12/22/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

8/23/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 12/22/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

Notice of Case Reassignment

05/05/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial

01/18/2022: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial

General Order (JURY TRIAL SETTING ORDER)

01/15/2022: General Order (JURY TRIAL SETTING ORDER)

Case Management Statement

01/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

12/22/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/09/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/07/2021: Case Management Statement

General Order (Case Management Order)

11/05/2021: General Order (Case Management Order)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/01/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

08/23/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 12/22/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

08/23/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 12/22/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

08/06/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andy Perez

08/06/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andy Perez

Complaint - Other Employment Filed

08/06/2021: Complaint - Other Employment Filed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 16 - Hon. Tara Desautelseffective 05/09/2022Reason: Inventory Transfer; Category: Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/25/2022 at 02:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 520 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/15/2022; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: General Order (JURY TRIAL SETTING ORDER) Entered by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Jury Trial scheduled for 07/07/2023 at 10:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 520; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 10:30 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 302; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/27/2023 at 02:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 520; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Andy Perez (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Curtiss-Wright Corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 520 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/05/2021; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketMessage: General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/25/2022 at 02:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 520; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by: Andy Perez (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by: Andy Perez (Plaintiff) As to: Curtiss-Wright Corporation (Defendant) Service Cost: 237.25 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 12/22/2021 09:30 AM D- 520; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andy Perez; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other Employment Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less