This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 21:30:46 (UTC).

Perez VS American AVK Co

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 Perez filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against American AVK Co. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9373

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEREZ, EVA R

PEREZ, JOSE

PEREZ RANGEL, JOSE

Eva R Perez

Jose Perez Rangel

Defendants

AMERICAN AVK CO

AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD

CHICAGO-WILCOX MANUFACTURING COMPANY

DCO, LLC

ITT CORPORATION,

MCWANE INC

MS2G INC

MUELLER CO

OFFICEMAX INCORPORATED

THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

WATER APPLICATIONS DISTRIBUTION GROUP INC

Not Yet Classified and Other

DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AMELL, DAVID L.

DUFFY, JOSEPH

FRAENKEL ESQ, CONSTANCE

GARDINER, KATHERINE P

GHANAAT, BINA

HAKE, WILLIAM M.

SAYRE, MARK D.

SHARP, GARY D.

Bina Ghanaat

Constance Fraenkel, Esq

David L. Amell

Edward Jerome Wright

Gary D. Sharp

James Najeeb Sinunu

Jeremy D. Milbrodt

Joseph Duffy

Katherine P Gardiner

Mark Anthony Love

Mark D. Sayre

William M. Hake

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Order INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

8/31/2021: Order INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

Case Management Conference 10/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

8/18/2021: Case Management Conference 10/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 36(d)

05/25/2022: Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 36(d)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

05/25/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration DECLARATION OF MARISSA C. LANGHOFF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 36(d)

05/25/2022: Declaration DECLARATION OF MARISSA C. LANGHOFF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 36(d)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

05/25/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion for Trial Preference

05/25/2022: Motion for Trial Preference

Case Management Statement

05/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

05/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Order STIPULATION AND ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

04/05/2022: Order STIPULATION AND ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Stipulation and Order AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

03/31/2022: Stipulation and Order AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

03/25/2022: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

03/18/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Substitution of Attorney

03/17/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice MS2G, Inc.'s Notice of Appearance

03/10/2022: Notice MS2G, Inc.'s Notice of Appearance

Case Management Statement

03/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

03/10/2022: Case Management Statement

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference scheduled for 06/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Jose Perez Rangel (Plaintiff) As to: American AVK Co (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Declaration DECLARATION OF MARISSA C. LANGHOFF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 36(d) Filed by: Jose Perez Rangel (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Jose Perez Rangel (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Motion for Trial Preference Filed by: Jose Perez Rangel (Plaintiff) As to: American AVK Co (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Jose Perez Rangel (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Designated Defense Counsel (Other Third Party); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketMessage: Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 12/23/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 12/16/2022 10:00 AM; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order STIPULATION AND ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketMessage: Stipulation and Order AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE Filed and Received by: Designated Defense Counsel (Other Third Party) As to: Designated Defense Counsel (Other Third Party); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMessage: PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMessage: Order RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMessage: Order INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 10/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 18; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Posting jury fees Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jose Perez; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Asbestos Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chicago-Wilcox Manufacturing Company is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MUELLER CO. LTD. L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where WATER APPLICATIONS DISTRIBUTION GROUP INC, is a litigant