This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 00:27:36 (UTC).

Peppas VS Costco Wholesale Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/18/2019 Peppas filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Costco Wholesale Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EVELIO GRILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3368

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

EVELIO GRILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEPPAS, DEAN

Defendant

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MEEKS, JORDAN M.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/18/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/18/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Costco Wholesale Corporation

1/15/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Costco Wholesale Corporation

Rejection Letter Issued on Continuance of Trial Date

1/14/2021: Rejection Letter Issued on Continuance of Trial Date

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/13/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint - Overruled

5/29/2020: Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint - Overruled

Notice of Non-Receipt of Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint Filed

5/8/2020: Notice of Non-Receipt of Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/27/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend

11/5/2019: Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

11/5/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion to Strike Complaint Filed for Defendant

8/29/2019: Motion to Strike Complaint Filed for Defendant

Answer to Complaint Filed for Costco Wholesale Corporation

8/29/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Costco Wholesale Corporation

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition To Demurrer To complaint Filed

10/23/2019: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition To Demurrer To complaint Filed

Case Management Statement of Costco Wholesale Corporation Filed

10/23/2019: Case Management Statement of Costco Wholesale Corporation Filed

Case Management Statement of Dean Peppas Filed

10/24/2019: Case Management Statement of Dean Peppas Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/31/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Initial Case Management Conference 10/31/2019 09:15 AM D- 15

6/19/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 10/31/2019 09:15 AM D- 15

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dean Peppas

6/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dean Peppas

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 15; Action: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 11/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 12/13/2021 10:00 AM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Costco Wholesale Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Costco Wholesale Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 11/05/2019 03:00 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in support of Automatic Extension Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporati

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Dean Peppas Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/31/2019 09:15 AM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Dean Peppas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dean Peppas

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEEKS JORDAN