This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/18/2020 at 14:08:47 (UTC).

Pennymac Holdings, LLC VS Mason

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Pennymac Holdings, LLC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Mason. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JO-LYNNE Q. LEE, DELBERT C. GEE and VICTORIA S. KOLAKOWSKI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1705

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

DELBERT C. GEE

VICTORIA S. KOLAKOWSKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

PMC REO FINANCING TRUST

PENNYMAC HOLDINGS, LLC

Defendants and Debtor / Appellees

MASON, ROBERT STEVEN

DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ, LETICIA

CORDONI, CARA PIETRINI

LOPEZ, DANIEL F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GASPARETTI, LORENZO EMILIO

BRAJE, KAREN A.

 

Court Documents

Statement Re: Oral Evidence in Support of Application for Court Judgment Filed

6/8/2020: Statement Re: Oral Evidence in Support of Application for Court Judgment Filed

Objection to Subsitiution of Attorney as Nex Friend Filed

2/6/2020: Objection to Subsitiution of Attorney as Nex Friend Filed

Declaration of Le T Duong ISO Objection Filed

2/6/2020: Declaration of Le T Duong ISO Objection Filed

Objection to Notice of Substitution of Attorney as Next Friend Filed

1/30/2020: Objection to Notice of Substitution of Attorney as Next Friend Filed

Case Management Statement of Pennymac Holdings, LLC Filed

1/17/2020: Case Management Statement of Pennymac Holdings, LLC Filed

Notice of of Substitution of Attorney as Next Friend; Points and Authorities Filed

1/21/2020: Notice of of Substitution of Attorney as Next Friend; Points and Authorities Filed

Case Management Statement of Daniel F. Lopez, Cara Pietrini Cordoni Filed

1/21/2020: Case Management Statement of Daniel F. Lopez, Cara Pietrini Cordoni Filed

Prove Up Hearing 01/29/2020 02:30 PM D- 514

1/3/2020: Prove Up Hearing 01/29/2020 02:30 PM D- 514

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Filed

8/16/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/6/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

8/6/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/8/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Pltff's Objection to Non-Party Zachary Smith's Notice of Stay pf proceedings Filed

6/3/2019: Pltff's Objection to Non-Party Zachary Smith's Notice of Stay pf proceedings Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Daniel F. Lopez Filed

5/28/2019: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Daniel F. Lopez Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Robert Steven Mason Filed

5/15/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Robert Steven Mason Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Cara Pietrini Cordoni Filed

5/15/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Cara Pietrini Cordoni Filed

Notice of Administrative Notice Filed

4/19/2019: Notice of Administrative Notice Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Pennymac Holdings, LLC

3/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Pennymac Holdings, LLC

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketMotion for Judgment on the Pleadings Hearing Dropped from dept: 512 date: 10/15/2020 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: Entry of Amended Judgment Pursuant to Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMotion for Judgment on the Pleadings Reservation Set for dept: 512 date: 10/15/2020 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Fraud; Judge: Victoria S. Kolakowski; Department: Dept 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketGeneral Civil Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketProve Up Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Prove Up Hearing 06/18/2020 10:30 AM D- 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement Re: Oral Evidence in Support of Application for Court Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement Of Non-Opposition To The Application for Court Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Robert Steven Mason Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Administrative Notice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver Hearing 04/24/2019 08:30 AM D- FHO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Hearing Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/02/2019 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Robert Steven Mason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Fraud Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Pennymac Holdings, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less