This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 03:42:14 (UTC).

Pena VS Superior Contracting Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 Pena filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Superior Contracting Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY BRAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2862

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JEFFREY BRAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENA, ALLAN

Defendants

SUPERIOR CONTRACTING CORPORATION

DBA COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS

TRUTEAM OF CALIFORNIAINC

BUILDER SERVICES GROUP, INC

SERVICE PARTNERS, LLC

TOPBUILD HOME SERVICES,INC

DBA COAST BUILDING PROBUCTS

AMERICAN NATIONAL INSULATION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HOLLIS, GRAHAM S.P.

DICKEY, CAROLINE C

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/2/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/10/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Initial Case Management Conference 04/13/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

9/14/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 04/13/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

5/20/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories - Motion Rescheduled

5/20/2021: Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories - Motion Rescheduled

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

4/26/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Reply ISO Motion to Compel Defendant Nat'l Insulation, Inc's to Provide Further Responses.. Filed

5/13/2021: Reply ISO Motion to Compel Defendant Nat'l Insulation, Inc's to Provide Further Responses.. Filed

Declaration of Service by Electronic re Reply ISO of Motion to Compel Defendant Filed

5/13/2021: Declaration of Service by Electronic re Reply ISO of Motion to Compel Defendant Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion to Compel Filed

5/7/2021: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion to Compel Filed

Case Management Statement of Allan Pena Filed

5/5/2021: Case Management Statement of Allan Pena Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

5/5/2021: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Proof of Service

4/23/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Proof of Service

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

4/30/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

3/29/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

4/2/2021: Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories Filed for Plaintiff

3/30/2021: Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories Filed for Plaintiff

Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - (Joint) for Dismissal of Truteam of CA From This Action

3/30/2021: Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - (Joint) for Dismissal of Truteam of CA From This Action

Declaration of Peter Wozniak in Response to Pltff's Request for an IDC Filed

3/10/2021: Declaration of Peter Wozniak in Response to Pltff's Request for an IDC Filed

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories; Judge: Jeffrey Brand; Department: Dept 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 22 date: 06/10/2021 time: 02:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories - Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Service by Electronic re Reply ISO of Motion to Compel Defendant Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply ISO Motion to Compel Defendant Nat'l Insulation, Inc's to Provide Further Responses.. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion to Compel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Allan Pena Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Superior Contracting Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Service Partners, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Builder Services Group, INC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Builder Services Group, INC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Service Partners, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/13/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Allan Pena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOPBUILD HOME SERVICES,INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN NATIONAL INSULATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE PARTNERS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Coast Building Products is a litigant