This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 12/17/2022 at 06:35:21 (UTC).

Pelz VS Carrier Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 Pelz filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Carrier Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Jo-Lynne Lee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0530

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Jo-Lynne Lee

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY

FREDRICKSON & WATSON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

THOMAS THOMPSON AUTOMOTIVE

PACCAR INC.

BENICIA AUTO PARTS

JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING INC.

CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY

SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.

OSH 2 LIQUIDATING LLC

ORINDA HARDWARE

CARRIER CORPORATION

THE DUTRA GROUP

MACK TRUCKS, INC.

D.W. NICHOLSON CORPORATION

CNH INDUSTRIAL AMERICA LLC

CATERPILLAR INC.

TRANE U.S. INC.

41 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support

12/29/2020: Declaration in Support

Declaration of Service by Mail

12/11/2020: Declaration of Service by Mail

Separate Statement Response

11/25/2020: Separate Statement Response

Objections to Evidence

11/25/2020: Objections to Evidence

Proposed Order

11/25/2020: Proposed Order

Declaration in Opposition

11/25/2020: Declaration in Opposition

Separate Statement of undisputed material Response

10/28/2020: Separate Statement of undisputed material Response

Objections to Evidence

10/28/2020: Objections to Evidence

Proposed Order

10/28/2020: Proposed Order

Declaration in Opposition Steven J Patti

10/28/2020: Declaration in Opposition Steven J Patti

Separate Statement

09/24/2020: Separate Statement

Proposed Order

09/24/2020: Proposed Order

Declaration in Support Jocelyn Leinart

09/24/2020: Declaration in Support Jocelyn Leinart

Declaration Daniel J. Bressler, M.D., F.A.C.P.

09/16/2020: Declaration Daniel J. Bressler, M.D., F.A.C.P.

Proposed Order

09/16/2020: Proposed Order

Declaration in Support Stephen Pelz

09/16/2020: Declaration in Support Stephen Pelz

Declaration in Support David R. Donadio

09/16/2020: Declaration in Support David R. Donadio

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support

09/16/2020: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support

376 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMessage: Dismissal As to Defendant: D.W. Nicholson Corporation Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party D.W. Nicholson Corporation Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing 10/15/2021 10:00 AM D- 18; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference Order Issued; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed; Category: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Continued Compliance Hearing Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMessage: Response To Notice Of Order To Show Cause Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMessage: Dismissal As to Defendant: Keenan Properties, Inc. Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
304 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketMessage: Order re Case Management Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketMessage: Order Re Designated Defense Counsel Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketMessage: Preliminary Fact Sheet Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 12/20/2019 09:15 AM D- 23; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Stephen Pelz; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Asbestos Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less