Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 21:02:54 (UTC).

PAYNE/KAELIN VS DE DIOS

Case Summary

On 11/21/1997 PAYNE/KAELIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DE DIOS. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FREMONT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7635

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fremont Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

FREMONT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAYNE, JASON ASHLEY

KAELIN, ERIK CONRAD

Defendant

CASILLAS, JOSE

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

3/24/1998: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

3/24/1998: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/30/1998 08:30 AM D- 6

6/29/1998: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/30/1998 08:30 AM D- 6

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2006
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 03/24/1998 08:30 AM D- 606

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/30/1998 08:30 AM D- 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/1998
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Fremont Judge Pro Tem; Department: Dept 606

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/1998
  • DocketORDER RETURNED UNSERVED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/1998
  • DocketCASE RESET FOR DATE 03/24/1998 08:30:00 AM D-6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/1998
  • DocketCASE RESET FOR DATE 02/10/1998 08:30:00 AM D-6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/1998
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF AND ORDER Filed For CASILLAS, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/1997
  • DocketORDER RETURNED UNSERVED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/1997
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 01/06/1998 08:30:00 AM D-6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/1997
  • DocketCLAIM OF PLAINTIFF, ORDER ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less