This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/27/2023 at 23:13:47 (UTC).

PAPE, et al. vs ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC., et al.

Case Summary

On 02/27/2023 PAPE, filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against ANDERSON, ROWE BUCKLEY, INC ,. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Patrick McKinney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8401

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Patrick McKinney

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC.

BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION;

BOSTON PROPERTIES, INC.

Benno Ashrafi

CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC.

CALIFORNIA AND HAWAIIAN SUGAR COMPANY;

CONWED CORPORATION f/k/a WOOD CONVERSION COMPANY

CROW HOLDINGS, LLC

D. ZELINSKY & SONS, INCORPORATED

DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC.

FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.

FLOWSERVE US, INC. solely as successor to EDWARD VALVES, INC.

FMC CORPORATION, individually and as successor in interest to NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY f/k/a NORTHERN FIRE APPARATUS COMPANY, CHICAGO PUMP COMPANY AND PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY

GIAMPOLINI GROUP LLC

GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL

GRINNELL LLC, dba GRINNELL CORPORATION

Geraldine Pape

HATHAWAY DINWIDDIE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

ITT LLC, f/k/a ITT CORPORATION, f/k/a ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., individually and as successor-in-interest to BELL & GOSSETT COMPANY, FOSTER ENGINEERING COMPANY and KENNENDY VALVE COMPANY

55 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

06/20/2023: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Request for Judicial Notice

06/20/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

06/20/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING INTERVENORS MASSACHUSETTS BAY INSURANCE COMPANY, MARYLAND CASUALTY COMPANY AND FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE COMPANY'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN ANSWER-IN-INTERVENTION

06/20/2023: Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING INTERVENORS MASSACHUSETTS BAY INSURANCE COMPANY, MARYLAND CASUALTY COMPANY AND FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE COMPANY'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN ANSWER-IN-INTERVENTION

Ex Parte Application Intervenors Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company, Maryland Casualty Company And Fireman Fund Insurance Company Notice Of Ex Parte Application And Ex Parte Application For Leave To File An Answer-In-Intervention

06/20/2023: Ex Parte Application Intervenors Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company, Maryland Casualty Company And Fireman Fund Insurance Company Notice Of Ex Parte Application And Ex Parte Application For Leave To File An Answer-In-Intervention

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Does Substitution)

06/07/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Does Substitution)

Answer

06/15/2023: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment

06/15/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment

Answer

06/12/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

06/05/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

06/05/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order re: Hearing on Motion to Quash DEFENDANT VIKING PUMP, INC.’S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFFS’ COMPLAINT AND FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; filed by VIKING PUMP, INC. (Defendant)

05/26/2023: Order re: Hearing on Motion to Quash DEFENDANT VIKING PUMP, INC.’S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFFS’ COMPLAINT AND FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; filed by VIKING PUMP, INC. (Defendant)

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash DEFENDANT VIKING PUMP, INC.’S MOTI...)

05/26/2023: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash DEFENDANT VIKING PUMP, INC.’S MOTI...)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Does Substitution)

05/17/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Does Substitution)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Does Substitution)

05/17/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Does Substitution)

Request for Dismissal

05/16/2023: Request for Dismissal

Answer

05/09/2023: Answer

Answer

05/11/2023: Answer

115 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketMessage: Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 18 - Hon. Patrick McKinney; Category: Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketMessage: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by: MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY, INC. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketMessage: Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY, INC. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketMessage: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY, INC. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketMessage: Ex Parte Application Intervenors Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company, Maryland Casualty Company And Fireman Fund Insurance Company Notice Of Ex Parte Application And Ex Parte Application For Leave To File An Answer-In-Intervention Filed by: MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY, INC. (Defendant); MARYLAND CASUALTY COMPANY AND FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); MASSACHUSETTS BAY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant) As to: Melvyn Pape (Plaintiff); Geraldine Pape (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: CALIFORNIA AND HAWAIIAN SUGAR COMPANY; (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: SUTTER HEALTH, individually and as successor in interest to ST. LUKES HOSPITAL (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketMessage: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Does Substitution) Filed by: Melvyn Pape (Plaintiff) As to: J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Melvyn Pape (Plaintiff) As to: MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY, INC. (Defendant); SUTTER HEALTH, individually and as successor in interest to ST. LUKES HOSPITAL (Defendant) Service Cost: 319.20 Service Date: 05/26/2023 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by: Melvyn Pape (Plaintiff) As to: MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY, INC. (Defendant) Service Cost: 319.20 Proof of Mailing Date: 05/30/2023 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
146 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- General Order (Court Order Designated Defense Counsel): Status Date changed from 03/16/2023 to 03/16/2023 Name Extension changed from (Court Order Designated Defense Counsel) to (Court Order Designated Defense Counsel) As To Parties: removed; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- General Order (Court Order Initial CMO): Status Date changed from 03/16/2023 to 03/16/2023 Name Extension changed from (Court Order Initial CMO) to (Court Order Initial CMO) As To Parties: removed; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by: Melvyn Pape (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketMessage: Case assigned to Hon. Richard Seabolt in Department 18 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse; Category: Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMessage: The case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Melvyn Pape (Plaintiff); Geraldine Pape (Plaintiff) As to: ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC. (Defendant); BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION; (Defendant); BOSTON PROPERTIES, INC. (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Melvyn Pape (Plaintiff); Geraldine Pape (Plaintiff) As to: ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC. (Defendant); BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION; (Defendant); BOSTON PROPERTIES, INC. (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Filed by: Melvyn Pape (Plaintiff); Geraldine Pape (Plaintiff) As to: ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC. (Defendant); BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION; (Defendant); BOSTON PROPERTIES, INC. (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less