This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/29/2022 at 15:48:32 (UTC).

Pandey VS Pathak

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 Pandey filed a Family - Marriage Annulment lawsuit against Pathak. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is REBEKAH EVENSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7095

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Annulment

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

REBEKAH EVENSON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PANDEY, VINAY

Respondent

PATHAK, ARUNIMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KREPELKA, TRAVIS I

SCARDAMAGLIA, JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketJudgment of Nullity Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketProposed Judgment Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Proposed Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketProposed Judgment Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations, and Waivers Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Appointment of Temporary Judge Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketLetter dated February 3rrd, 2022 Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Appointment of Temporary Judge Filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Request for Order re:...; Judge: Rebekah Evenson; Department: Dept 522

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration Filed for Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order re:... Spousal Support,.. Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of John Scardamaglia ISO Request for Attorney Fees Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketResponse to Petition for Nullity of Marriage Filed for Arunima Pathak

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Arunima Pathak Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons by Mail w/ attached Notice of Acknowlegment of Receipt Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Arunima Pathak

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Arunima Pathak

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketPetition for Nullity of Marriage Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSummons on Petition Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less