Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 13:06:03 (UTC).

Pacific Gas & Electric Company VS Steiny & Co., Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2000 Pacific Gas Electric Company filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Steiny Co , Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARLENE KOCK, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0930

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

ARLENE KOCK, PORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY

Defendant

STEINY & CO., INC.

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

5/12/2000: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

6/6/2000: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Claim of Defendant Filed for Steiny & Co., Inc.

6/9/2000: Claim of Defendant Filed for Steiny & Co., Inc.

Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

6/14/2000: Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

6/29/2000: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

6/29/2000: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

6/29/2000: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

6/29/2000: Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

Miscellaneous Exhibit record Filed

6/29/2000: Miscellaneous Exhibit record Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

8/23/2000: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2000
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2000
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Arlene Kock, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2000
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 702 date: 08/24/2000 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Exhibit record Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2000
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Valid As to Pacific Gas & Electric Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Defendant Filed for Steiny & Co., Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2000
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Valid As to Steiny & Co., Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2000
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 06/29/2000 03:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific Gas and Electric Company is a litigant