Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/25/2021 at 04:26:26 (UTC).

Pacific Bell Telephone Compan VS Alameda County Water Distri

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Pacific Bell Telephone Compan filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Alameda County Water Distri. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NOL WISE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0945

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

Defendant

ALAMEDA COUNTY WATER DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RATHFON, STEVEN D.

HAZELWOOD, MARK F.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

3/29/2021: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

11/6/2020: Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Alameda County Water District

10/23/2020: Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Alameda County Water District

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 06/02/2021 09:01 AM D- 24

11/13/2020: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 06/02/2021 09:01 AM D- 24

Case Management Statement of Pacific Bell Telephone Company Filed

9/10/2020: Case Management Statement of Pacific Bell Telephone Company Filed

Case Management Statement of Alameda County Water District Filed

9/11/2020: Case Management Statement of Alameda County Water District Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

9/22/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/22/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Alameda County Water District

7/30/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Alameda County Water District

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

7/30/2020: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alameda County Water District Filed

7/15/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alameda County Water District Filed

First Amended Complaint Filed

6/10/2020: First Amended Complaint Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 09/28/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

5/19/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 09/28/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/19/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/11/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Pacific Bell Telephone Company

5/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Pacific Bell Telephone Company

Complaint Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation Filed

5/11/2020: Complaint Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation Filed

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Complaint Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 06/02/2021 09:01 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Pretrial Conference 07/09/2021 10:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 07/19/2021 09:30 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Alameda County Water District

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Pacific Bell Telephone Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Alameda County Water District

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Alameda County Water District Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/28/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Pacific Bell Telephone Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALAMEDA COUNTY WATER DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RATHFON, STEVEN D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAZELWOOD, MARK F