This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 02:49:25 (UTC).

Ordonez-Castellon VS Aerotek, Inc

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Ordonez-Castellon filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Aerotek, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NOL WISE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5302

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ, MINERVA

ORDONEZ-CASTELLON, ROGER

LOPEZ CERVANTES, MINERVA

Defendants

DOE, JOHN

AEROTEK, INC

METTLER-TOLEDO RAININ, LLC

ALLEGIS GROUP HOLDINGS, INC

ALLEGIS GROUP, INC

CAYTON , DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DALBY, ROBERT A.

BURNS, MEGAN T.

BEEMAN, CHRISTOPHER J.

ISOLA, ERNEST M.

WOOD, CHRISTOPHER W.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

8/31/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/31/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/10/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/10/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/11/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/11/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/11/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

11/16/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/11/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/21/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Withdrawal from Joint Stipulation OST Filed

9/22/2021: Notice of Withdrawal from Joint Stipulation OST Filed

Notice of Withdrawl Filed

9/16/2021: Notice of Withdrawl Filed

Notice of Withdrawal of Unavailability of Counsel Filed

9/1/2021: Notice of Withdrawal of Unavailability of Counsel Filed

Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Filed

9/8/2021: Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Filed

Motion to Continue

8/18/2021: Motion to Continue

Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Aerotek, Inc, Allegis Group Holdings, Inc, Allegis G

8/18/2021: Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Aerotek, Inc, Allegis Group Holdings, Inc, Allegis G

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Shortening Notice PPerios For Motion

8/12/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Shortening Notice PPerios For Motion

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Daniel Cayton

6/9/2021: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Daniel Cayton

Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Filed for Aerotek, Inc

7/27/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Filed for Aerotek, Inc

Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Granted in Part

7/29/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Granted in Part

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment Hearing Dropped from dept: 24 date: 10/28/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment Hearing Dropped from dept: 24 date: 10/28/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment Hearing Dropped from dept: 24 date: 10/28/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment Hearing Dropped from dept: 24 date: 10/28/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal from Joint Stipulation OST Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMotion to Continue Hearing Dropped from dept: 24 date: 10/14/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawl Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/31/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Roger Ordonez-Castellon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Minerva Lopez Cervantes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/15/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Roger Ordonez-Castellon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLEGIS GROUP HOLDINGS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where METTLER-TOLEDO RAININ, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AEROTEK INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURNS, MEGAN T.