This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/21/2020 at 23:54:55 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. VS Velazquez

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Velazquez. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4686

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

VELAZQUEZ , VERONICA VALENZUELA

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

8/13/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/19/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

7/30/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/19/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

3/9/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/19/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

4/10/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/19/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 05/18/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

3/9/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 05/18/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

2/13/2020: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/19/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/19/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 05/18/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 03/09/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less