This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 13:31:06 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. VS Vargas

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Vargas. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BENTRISH A SATARZADEH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3924

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BENTRISH A SATARZADEH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

VARGAS, FELIX TORRES

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

12/4/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

12/4/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

12/4/2019: Judgment Entered

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

11/4/2019: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

8/30/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Bentrish A Satarzadeh; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 12/04/2019 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 12/04/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less