This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/03/2020 at 04:02:19 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. VS Ramirez

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Ramirez. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KARIN S SCHWARTZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4080

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

KARIN S SCHWARTZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

RAMIREZ , JONATHAN MANUEL FLORES

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

8/3/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

8/3/2020: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/03/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

7/22/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/03/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/03/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

5/6/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/03/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

3/12/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 05/27/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

3/12/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 05/27/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

2/7/2020: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Karin S Schwartz; Department: Dept 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/03/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/03/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 05/27/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 03/12/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less